There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fix Gun Checks Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that all individuals who should be prohibited from buying a firearm are listed in the national instant criminal background check system and require a background check for every firearm sale.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/29/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/28/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: House Judiciary
07/29/2015 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/29/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/29/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/29/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/08/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/29/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 10/06/2015
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/06/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 10/20/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/20/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/20/2015
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/20/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/20/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/21/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/21/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/21/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/27/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/29/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/29/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/02/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/03/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/03/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/03/2015
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 11/03/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/03/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/03/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/03/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/03/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/03/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/03/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/16/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/02/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/02/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 12/07/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/09/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/09/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/09/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/09/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/10/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/11/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 12/11/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/11/2015
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 12/11/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/15/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/15/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/17/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/17/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/17/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/17/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/17/2015
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/17/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/17/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/01/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 03/15/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/15/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 05/25/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/24/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/05/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/05/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/06/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/07/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/07/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/12/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/13/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/21/2016
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/06/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/06/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/27/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/27/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/28/2016
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 09/28/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/29/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/28/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Crimes against property
  • Criminal justice information and records
  • Firearms and explosives
  • Judicial procedure and administration
  • Mental health

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3411. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/29/2015)

Fix Gun Checks Act of 2015

This bill amends the NICS Improvement Amendments Act of 2007 to revise an eligibility condition for a state to receive a grant under the NICS Act Record Improvement Program and a waiver of the grant match requirement under the National Criminal History Improvement Program.

Specifically, it directs the Department of Justice (DOJ) to establish a four-year state implementation plan, including benchmarks, to maximize the automation and submission of mental health and criminal history records to the National Instant Criminal Back Check System (NICS). DOJ must reduce the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance (JAG) Program funding for a state that fails to comply with benchmarks.

The bill amends the Brady Handgun Violence Prevention Act to require each federal agency and department, including a federal court, to certify whether it has provided to the Federal Bureau of Investigation disqualifying records of persons prohibited from receiving or possessing a firearm.

It amends the federal criminal code and the NICS Improvement Amendments Act of 2007 to define the terms "adjudicated as a mental defective" and "committed to a mental institution."

The bill extends the Brady Handgun Violence Prevention Act background check requirements to a transfer of a firearm between private parties by prohibiting such a transfer unless a licensed importer, manufacturer, or dealer has first taken possession of the firearm for the purpose of submitting a background check.

A gun owner must report a lost or stolen firearm to DOJ and local law enforcement authorities within 48 hours of discovery.