Text: H.R.3423 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/29/2015)


114th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 3423


To amend title 38, United States Code, and the Agent Orange Act of 1991 to extend the certain authorities of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs regarding associations between diseases and exposure to dioxin and other chemical compounds in herbicides.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

July 29, 2015

Mr. Walz (for himself, Mr. Jones, Mr. Gibson, Miss Rice of New York, Mr. Nolan, and Mr. Takano) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Veterans’ Affairs


A BILL

To amend title 38, United States Code, and the Agent Orange Act of 1991 to extend the certain authorities of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs regarding associations between diseases and exposure to dioxin and other chemical compounds in herbicides.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Agent Orange Extension Act of 2015”.

SEC. 2. Extension of certain authorities of Secretary of Veterans Affairs regarding associations between diseases and exposure to dioxin and other chemical compounds in herbicides.

(a) Use of information To provide for presumption of service connection.—Section 1116(e) of title 38, United States Code, is amended by striking “September 30, 2015” and inserting “September 30, 2017”.

(b) Agreement with National Academy of Sciences.—Section 3(i) of the Agent Orange Act of 1991 (Public Law 102–4; 38 U.S.C. 1116 note) is amended by striking “December 31, 2015” and inserting “December 31, 2017”.