There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Gun Trafficking Prevention Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent gun trafficking.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
09/28/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/09/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1240)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 09/09/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 09/10/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/10/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/10/2015
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 09/10/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/10/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/16/2015
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/16/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/18/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/25/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/09/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/09/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/09/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/09/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 10/21/2015
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/22/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/22/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 10/22/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/02/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/02/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/03/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 12/08/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/08/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/17/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/17/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/17/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/17/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/06/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/06/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/06/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/07/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/08/2016
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/08/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/08/2016
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/08/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/08/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/08/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/08/2016
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/08/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/08/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/08/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/08/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/08/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/08/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/08/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/08/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/08/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/13/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/13/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/13/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/13/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/14/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/09/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/09/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/09/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/09/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/09/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/09/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/28/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3455.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3455. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/09/2015)

Gun Trafficking Prevention Act of 2015

This bill amends the federal criminal code to make trafficking in firearms a crime. Specifically, it prohibits:

  • purchasing or transferring a firearm with the intent to deliver it to a prohibited person;
  • providing false or misleading material information in connection with a firearm purchase or transfer; and
  • directing, promoting, or facilitating such prohibited conduct.

The prohibition does not apply to a firearm lawfully acquired to give as a gift or lawfully received as a gift.

A person who commits a gun trafficking offense is subject to a prison term of up to 20 years (or 25 years if such person also acted as an organizer). A person who conspires to commit a gun trafficking offense is subject to a prison term of up to 10 years. 

The U.S. Sentencing Commission must review and, if appropriate, amend the sentencing guidelines and policy statements that apply to persons convicted of trafficking in firearms.