There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting Local Business Opportunity Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Local Business Opportunity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify the treatment of two or more employers as joint employers under the National Labor Relations Act.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/01/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 114-355.
09/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
12/01/2015Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 272.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/01/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 114-355.
10/28/2015Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 15.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
10/28/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
09/29/2015Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions
09/09/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (117)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 09/09/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 09/18/2015
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/18/2015
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/18/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/18/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/18/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/18/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/18/2015
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 09/18/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/18/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/18/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 09/18/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/28/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/28/2015
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/28/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/28/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/28/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/28/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/28/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 09/28/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 10/01/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/01/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/01/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/01/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/01/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 10/01/2015
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 10/01/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 10/01/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/01/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/01/2015
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 10/01/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 10/01/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/01/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/01/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 10/01/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 10/01/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/07/2015
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/07/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/07/2015
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 10/07/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/07/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 10/07/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/07/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/07/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 10/07/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/07/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 10/07/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 10/09/2015
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/09/2015
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 10/09/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/09/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/09/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/09/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/09/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/09/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/09/2015
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/21/2015
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 10/21/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/23/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/23/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/23/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 10/23/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/23/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 10/23/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 10/27/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/27/2015
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/27/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/03/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 11/03/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 11/03/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 11/03/2015
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 11/03/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/03/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/03/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 11/03/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 11/03/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/03/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/03/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/03/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 11/03/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/03/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/03/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/03/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/03/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/16/2015
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/19/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/30/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/30/2015
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 12/01/2015
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 12/01/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce09/09/2015 Referred to
10/28/2015 Markup by
12/01/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-355
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions09/29/2015 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3459. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (12/01/2015)

Protecting Local Business Opportunity Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the National Labor Relations Act to allow two or more employers to be considered joint employers for purposes of the Act only if each employer shares and exercises control over essential terms and conditions of employment and such control over these matters is actual, direct, and immediate.