There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To suspend until January 21, 2017, the authority of the President to waive, suspend, reduce, provide relief from, or otherwise limit the application of sanctions pursuant to an agreement related to the nuclear program of Iran.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/11/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 247 - 186 (Roll no. 494).(text: CR H5947)
09/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
07/14/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/15/2015SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/11/2015-12:46pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/11/2015-12:46pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 247 - 186 (Roll no. 494). (text: CR H5947)
09/11/2015-12:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5968-5969)
09/11/2015-12:06pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on passage of H.R. 3460 and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Levin demanded a recorded vote and pursuant to clause 8, rule XX, the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until after completion of the roll call vote on H.R. 3461.
09/11/2015-12:05pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H5967)
09/11/2015-9:20amHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 412, the House proceeded with 2 hours of debate on H.R. 3460.
09/11/2015-9:19amHouseResolution provides for consideration of 3 measures: H. Res. 411; H.R.3460; and H.R. 3461.
09/11/2015-9:19amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 412. (consideration: CR H5947-5967)
09/10/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/09/2015-10:36pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 412 Reported to House. Resolution provides for consideration of 3 measures: H. Res. 411; H.R.3460; and H.R. 3461.
09/09/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/09/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/09/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/09/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/09/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/09/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/09/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/10/2015

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs09/09/2015 Referred to
House Financial Services09/09/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary09/09/2015 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform09/09/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/09/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade09/10/2015 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations07/14/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3460. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/11/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

(Sec. 1) This bill prohibits the President, prior to January 21, 2017, from:

  • limiting the application of specified sanctions on Iran or refraining from applying any such sanctions; or
  • removing a foreign person (including entities) listed in Attachments 3 or 4 to Annex II of the Joint Comprehensive Plan of Action (JCPA) from the list of designated nationals and blocked persons maintained by the Office of Foreign Assets Control of the Department of the Treasury.

The sanctions are those contained in:

  • sections 4 through 7.9 of Annex II of the JCPA; and
  • any other agreement related to Iran's nuclear program that includes the United States, commits the United States to take action, or pursuant to which the United States commits or otherwise agrees to take action, regardless of the form it takes, whether a political commitment or otherwise, and regardless of whether the agreement is legally binding or not.

The Joint Comprehensive Plan of Action is the agreement signed at Vienna on July 14, 2015, by Iran and by China, France, Germany, the Russian Federation, the United Kingdom, and the United States, with the High Representative of the European Union for Foreign Affairs and Security Policy, and all implementing materials and agreements related to the JCPA.