There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To approve the Joint Comprehensive Plan of Action, signed at Vienna on July 14, 2015, relating to the nuclear program of Iran.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/11/2015 Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On passage Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 162 - 269, 1 Present (Roll no. 493).
09/09/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date
09/11/2015-12:31pm Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/2015-12:31pm On passage Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 162 - 269, 1 Present (Roll no. 493).
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/2015-12:06pm Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5967-5968)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/2015-12:06pm UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that proceedings would now resume on H.R. 3461 which had been postponed from Thursday, September 10, 2015.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2015-9:00pm POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on passage of H.R. 3461 and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Royce demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2015-9:00pm The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H5935)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2015-5:27pm DEBATE - The House proceeded with three hours of debate on H.R. 3461.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2015-5:27pm Resolution provides for consideration of 3 measures: H. Res. 411; H.R.3460; and H.R. 3461.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2015-5:27pm Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 412. (consideration: CR H5911-5935; text of measure as introduced: CR H5911)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/10/2015-2:17pm Rule H. Res. 412 passed House.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015-10:36pm Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 412 Reported to House. Resolution provides for consideration of 3 measures: H. Res. 411; H.R.3460; and H.R. 3461.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015 Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015 Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015 Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015 Referred to House Financial Services
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015 Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs09/09/2015 Referred to
House Financial Services09/09/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary09/09/2015 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform09/09/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/09/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade09/10/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (7)

  • Arms control and nonproliferation
  • Congressional-executive branch relations
  • International law and treaties
  • Iran
  • Middle East
  • Nuclear weapons

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3461. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/09/2015)

This bill states that Congress favors the Joint Comprehensive Plan of Action relating to Iran's nuclear program, signed in Vienna, Austria, on July 14, 2015.