Committees: H.R.3471 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/10/2015 Referred to
05/18/2016 Markup by
09/06/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-709
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health09/25/2015 Referred to
11/17/2015 Hearings by
04/29/2016 Markup by
04/29/2016 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs09/25/2015 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs09/13/2016 Referred to
11/17/2016 Discharged from