Committees: H.R.348 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/14/2015 Referred to
03/24/2015 Markup by
07/27/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-228
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law02/05/2015 Referred to
03/02/2015 Hearings by
03/23/2015 Discharged from
House Natural Resources01/14/2015 Referred to
09/11/2015 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works09/28/2015 Referred to