There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Los Angeles Homeless Veterans Leasing Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Los Angeles Homeless Veterans Leasing Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to enter into certain leases at the Department of Veterans Affairs West Los Angeles Campus in Los Angeles, California, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/17/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-570.
09/10/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
05/17/2016Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 442.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-570.
02/25/2016Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/25/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/25/2016Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
12/08/2015Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
09/25/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/10/2015Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/10/2015 Referred to
02/25/2016 Markup by
05/17/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-570
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health09/25/2015 Referred to
12/08/2015 Hearings by
02/25/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3484. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (05/17/2016)

Los Angeles Homeless Veterans Leasing Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out the following leases at the VA's West Los Angeles Campus in Los Angeles, California:

  • any enhanced-use lease of real property for supportive housing that principally benefits veterans and their families;
  • any lease of real property for not to exceed 50 years to a third party for services that principally benefit veterans and their families and that are related to health and wellness, education, vocational training and employment, peer activities or recreation, legal and federal benefits assistance, volunteerism, family support services, and transportation; and
  • a lease of real property for not to exceed 10 years to the Regents of the University of California, on behalf of the University of California, Los Angeles, if the lease is consistent with the VA master plan and the provision of veterans services is the predominant focus.

The VA shall not enter into any land-sharing agreements unless the agreements provide additional health care resources and benefit veterans and their families in ways other than generating additional revenue.

Any funds received by the VA from a lease shall be credited to the applicable VA medical facilities account and shall be available, without fiscal year limitation and without further appropriation, exclusively for campus renovation and maintenance.

The VA may, notwithstanding any other provision of law other than federal laws relating to environmental and historic preservation, grant easements or rights-of-way on, above, or under campus lands to:

  • any local or regional public transportation authority to construct, operate, or maintain public mass transit facilities; and
  • California, the County of Los Angeles, the City of Los Angeles, any agency or political subdivision thereof, or any public utility company for the purpose of providing public utilities.

The VA may not sell or convey to a third party fee simple title to any real property or related improvements made at the campus.

The VA shall ensure that each lease is consistent with the draft master plan approved by the VA on January 28, 2016, or successor master plans.

The VA shall establish a Community Veterans Engagement Board to coordinate locally with the VA to: (1) identify community goals; and (2) provide advice to improve services for veterans, members of the Armed Forces, and their families.