There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Respect for Native Americans in Professional Sports Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make the antitrust laws applicable to professional sports leagues that use, or promote or allow member teams or franchisees to use, the term "Redskins" or the term "Redskin".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/10/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
10/05/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/10/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2015Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1251)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/24/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/29/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/18/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/18/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/10/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law10/05/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3487.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3487. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/10/2015)

Respect for Native Americans in Professional Sports Act of 2015

This bill applies the antitrust laws to a professional sports league that uses, or promotes or allows a member team or franchisee to use or promote the use of, "Redskins" or "Redskin" in connection with such league or a team or franchise connected with such league.