There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Women's Public Health and Safety Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to allow for greater State flexibility with respect to excluding providers who are involved in abortions.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/29/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 236 - 193 (Roll no. 524).(text: CR H6324)
09/11/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
07/14/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
09/30/2015SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/29/2015-4:27pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 236 - 193 (Roll no. 524). (text: CR H6324)
09/29/2015-4:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2015-4:19pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 184 - 242 (Roll no. 523).
09/29/2015-3:47pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6335-6337)
09/29/2015-3:20pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Sinema demanded the yeas and nays which were ordered and pursuant to a previous order of the House, further proceedings on the question of adoption of the motion to recommit were postponed until a time to be announced.
09/29/2015-3:20pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H6335)
09/29/2015-3:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with ten minutes of debate on the Sinema motion to recommit with instructions, pending reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendent ensuring that nothing in the underlying bill shall be construed as prohibiting health care services from being provided to a woman by an institution, agency, entity, or person so long as such services are provided to protect the health of a woman. Subsequently, the reservation of the point of order was withdrawn.
09/29/2015-3:14pmHouseMs. Sinema moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H6334-6335, H6335-6336; text: CR H6334)
09/29/2015-3:14pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6334)
09/29/2015-3:13pmHouseORDER OF PROCEDURE - At the conclusion of debate, Mr. Pitts asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting a motion to recommit on H.R. 3495 may be subject to postponement as though under clause 8 rule XX. Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2015-2:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3495.
09/29/2015-1:59pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 3495 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
09/29/2015-1:59pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 444. (consideration: CR H6324-6335)
09/29/2015-1:58pmHouseRule H. Res. 444 passed House.
09/28/2015-6:41pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 444 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3495 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
09/18/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/11/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/11/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/11/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/18/2015 Referred to
Senate Finance07/14/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3495. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/29/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Women's Public Health and Safety Act

 

(Sec. 2) This bill amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act to modify requirements regarding a state plan for medical assistance.  Under current law, a state plan for medical assistance must provide that any individual eligible for medical assistance may obtain required services from any institution, agency, or person qualified to perform them.  The bill specifies that a state may not be required to provide medical assistance for services furnished by any individual or entity based on the individual's or entity's involvement in abortions.