There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Homeland Security Cybersecurity Strategy Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Department of Homeland Security Cybersecurity Strategy Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Homeland Security Cybersecurity Strategy Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Secretary of Homeland Security to develop a cybersecurity strategy for the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/06/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6813-6814)
10/06/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-284.
09/15/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/07/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
10/06/2015-5:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/06/2015-5:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6813-6814)
10/06/2015-5:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3510.
10/06/2015-5:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6813-6815)
10/06/2015-5:21pmHouseMr. Ratcliffe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/06/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 216.
10/06/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-284.
09/30/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/30/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/17/2015HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies
09/17/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies
09/16/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/15/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
09/15/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 09/28/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/06/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/06/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security09/15/2015 Referred to
09/30/2015 Markup by
10/06/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-284
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies09/16/2015 Referred to
09/17/2015 Markup by
09/17/2015 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/07/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3510.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3510. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/06/2015)

Department of Homeland Security Cybersecurity Strategy Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to develop a cybersecurity strategy that includes: (1) strategic and operational goals and priorities to execute the full range of DHS's cybersecurity responsibilities; and (2) information on programs, policies, and activities in furtherance of the cybersecurity functions of the national cybersecurity and communications integration center (NCCIC), investigations capabilities, research and development, and engagement with international partners.

In developing the strategy, DHS must consider: (1) the cybersecurity strategy published in November 2011 for governmental and nongovernmental entities involved in homeland security, including federal, state, local, and tribal government officials, private sector representatives, academics, and other policy experts; (2) the Department of Homeland Security Fiscal Years 2014-2018 Strategic Plan; and (3) the most recent Quadrennial Homeland Security Review.

The strategy must include the roles and responsibilities of DHS components and offices.

DHS must also issue an implementation plan that includes strategic objectives, projected timelines, costs for tasks, and evaluation metrics.

DHS must submit the strategy and implementation plan to Congress.

The bill prohibits the strategy from being construed as permitting DHS to engage in monitoring, surveillance, exfiltration, or other collection activities to track an individual's personally identifiable information.

The bill also prohibits DHS from changing the location or reporting structure of the National Protection and Programs Directorate without prior authorization from Congress.

For purposes of the NCCIC, the bill redefines "incident" to include occurrences that actually or imminently jeopardize, without lawful authority, an information system, thereby replacing a standard that currently includes a violation or imminent threat of violation of law, security policies, security procedures, or acceptable use policies.