There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Beneficiary 2nd Amendment Rights Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Social Security Act relating to the use of determinations made by the Commissioner.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/21/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/16/2015Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (141)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/17/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 09/17/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/17/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/17/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 09/17/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/17/2015
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/17/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/17/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/17/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/24/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/24/2015
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/24/2015
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/24/2015
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 09/25/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/28/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/28/2015
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/28/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/28/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/28/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/28/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/28/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/29/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/29/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/30/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/30/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/01/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/01/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 10/01/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/01/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/01/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/01/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 10/01/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/01/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/06/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 10/06/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 10/06/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/06/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/09/2015
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/20/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 10/20/2015
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 10/20/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/21/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/21/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 10/21/2015
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4] 10/21/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/21/2015
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/22/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 10/22/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/22/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/26/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/26/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/28/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 10/28/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/28/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/02/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/02/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 11/02/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/03/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 11/05/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/05/2015
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/16/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/17/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/17/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/18/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/18/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/18/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/18/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/18/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/18/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/18/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 11/18/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/19/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/30/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/30/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 11/30/2015
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/30/2015
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/30/2015
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 12/02/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/08/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/08/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/08/2015
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/08/2015
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/09/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/09/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 12/10/2015
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 12/11/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/05/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/06/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 01/06/2016
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 01/06/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/06/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/06/2016
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 01/06/2016
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/06/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/06/2016
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 01/07/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/02/2016
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 02/03/2016
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/03/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/03/2016
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/04/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 02/04/2016
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/08/2016
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/08/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/10/2016
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 02/11/2016
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/29/2016
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/01/2016
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/02/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/17/2016
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 05/18/2016
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/19/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/23/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/24/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/24/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/24/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/25/2016
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/25/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 06/03/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/03/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/07/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/07/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/09/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/14/2016
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/07/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/16/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security09/21/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3516. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/16/2015)

Social Security Beneficiary 2nd Amendment Rights Protection Act

This bill amends titles II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) and XVI (Supplemental Security Income) (SSI) of the Social Security Act to prohibit any determination by the Commissioner of Social Security with respect to an individual, including one that OASDI and SSI benefits to which that individual is entitled shall be paid to a representative payee, from being considered to be a determination that the individual has been adjudicated as a mental defective to make it unlawful for the individual to engage in the shipment or transport of firearms or ammunition or receive any firearm or ammunition which has been shipped or transported in interstate or foreign commerce.