There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Pulmonary Hypertension Research and Diagnosis Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish an interagency coordinating committee on pulmonary hypertension, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/18/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/16/2015Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/22/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 09/22/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/22/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/22/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/25/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 09/25/2015
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 09/29/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/02/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/16/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/20/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/20/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/23/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/23/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/23/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/27/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/04/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/16/2015
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/03/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 12/03/2015
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/09/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/09/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/11/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/15/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/18/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 01/08/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 01/08/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/11/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 02/01/2016
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/08/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/09/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/09/2016
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/11/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 02/24/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/02/2016
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/02/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/15/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/19/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/20/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/20/2016
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/27/2016
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/31/2016
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/07/2016
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/07/2016
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/09/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/21/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/05/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/14/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/06/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/06/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/06/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/08/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/08/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/09/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/09/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/09/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 11/15/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/15/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/15/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/15/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/06/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/16/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/18/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3520.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3520. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/16/2015)

Pulmonary Hypertension Research and Diagnosis Act of 2015

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish the Interagency Pulmonary Hypertension Coordinating Committee. The committee must monitor research and annually summarize research and medical advances regarding pulmonary hypertension.

The committee must develop a comprehensive strategic plan to improve health outcomes for individuals with pulmonary hypertension. The plan must include recommendations regarding pulmonary hypertension diagnosis, research, transplantation criteria, public awareness, and health care delivery.

HHS must report on activities related to improving health outcomes for individuals with pulmonary hypertension. The report must include information regarding pulmonary hypertension epidemiology, treatment, support available to individuals, and research.