There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CECIL Act
Conserving Ecosystems by Ceasing the Importation of Large Animal Trophies Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to extend the import- and export-related provision of that Act to species proposed for listing as threatened or endangered under that Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
09/21/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/16/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 09/16/2015
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/20/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/20/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/20/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 10/20/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/20/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/20/2015
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/20/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/05/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/05/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/05/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/05/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/08/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/08/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/14/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/16/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/22/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/08/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/28/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 12/08/2016

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources09/16/2015 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs09/16/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/16/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade09/21/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3526. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/16/2015)

Conserving Ecosystems by Ceasing the Importation of Large Animal Trophies Act or the CECIL Act

This bill amends the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to apply the Act's prohibitions on importing or exporting species listed as threatened or endangered to species proposed to be listed as well.

The Government Accountability Office must conduct and submit a report on the results of a study of the effectiveness of trophy hunting in supporting international wildlife conservation efforts.