There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Access to Hearing Health Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to include licensed hearing aid specialists as eligible for appointment in the Veterans Health Administration of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/14/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
04/29/2016Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
04/29/2016Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
07/14/2015Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
02/06/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/14/2015Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/14/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/14/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 01/14/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/20/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/20/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/21/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/21/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 01/21/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/21/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/26/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/26/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 01/28/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/11/2015
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 02/25/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/25/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/02/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/02/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/10/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 03/16/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/19/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/13/2015
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/16/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/22/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/12/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 05/13/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 05/19/2015
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 06/15/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/07/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/08/2015
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/08/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/13/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/21/2015
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/09/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/16/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/03/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/08/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/22/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 05/10/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs01/14/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/06/2015 Referred to
07/14/2015 Hearings by
04/29/2016 Markup by
04/29/2016 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.353. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/14/2015)

Veterans' Access to Hearing Health Act of 2015

Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to appoint licensed hearing aid specialists in the Veterans Health Administration.

Requires the Secretary to submit an annual report on: (1) the timely access of veterans to VA hearing health services, and (2) VA contracting policies regarding the provision of hearing health services to veterans in non-VA facilities.