There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Alice Cogswell and Anne Sullivan Macy Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote and ensure delivery of high quality special education and related services to students with visual disabilities or who are deaf or hard of hearing or deaf-blind through instructional methodologies meeting their unique learning needs; to enhance accountability for the provision of such services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/17/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/23/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
09/17/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/28/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 10/02/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/20/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 10/28/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/18/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/10/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/07/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/03/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/09/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/07/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/07/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/07/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/07/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/14/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/29/2016
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 04/29/2016
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/29/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/29/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/29/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/16/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/08/2016
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/13/2016
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/14/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/15/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/05/2016
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/05/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/05/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/07/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/28/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/15/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 11/15/2016
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 11/30/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/08/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce09/17/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education03/23/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3535.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3535. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/17/2015)

Alice Cogswell and Anne Sullivan Macy Act

This bill amends the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act to require a state to identify, evaluate, and provide special education and related services to children who have visual or hearing disabilities (or both) and also are, or may be, classified in another disability category. A state must ensure that it has enough qualified personnel to serve children who have such disabilities and that a full continuum of alternative placements is available to meet the needs of disabled children for special education and related services.

The individualized education program for each child that is either (or both) visually or hearing impaired must include specified components and must provide the child with instruction that meets the child's unique learning needs. Similarly, the individualized family service plan for an infant or toddler with a hearing disability must include specified components.

A states' closure of a special school serving deaf or blind children shall count as a reduction of its financial support for special education and related services for purposes of the prohibition against reducing state financial support for such services from one fiscal year to the next.

The bill also: (1) authorizes grants for training special education personnel, to be used in preparing individuals to become qualified teachers and early intervention specialists for children with hearing disabilities; and (2) establishes within the Department of Education the Anne Sullivan Macy Center on Visual Disability and Educational Excellence to better support students with visual disabilities.