There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Dangerous Synthetic Drug Control Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Synthetic Drug Control Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to add certain synthetic substances to schedule I, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to clarify how controlled substance analogues are to be regulated, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
09/26/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 258 - 101 (Roll no. 557).(text: CR H5871-5872)
09/26/2016Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
09/26/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-787, Part I.
09/17/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
09/27/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/26/2016-6:52pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2016-6:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2016-6:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 258 - 101 (Roll no. 557). (text: CR H5871-5872)
09/26/2016-6:32pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5893)
09/26/2016-2:31pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/26/2016-2:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3537.
09/26/2016-2:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5871-5874)
09/26/2016-2:18pmHouseMr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/26/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 615.
09/26/2016HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
09/26/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-787, Part I.
09/21/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/21/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/20/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/17/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/04/2015HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
11/04/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
11/03/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
10/05/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/18/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/17/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/17/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/17/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/17/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/17/2015 Referred to
09/21/2016 Markup by
09/26/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-787
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/18/2015 Referred to
11/04/2015 Markup by
11/04/2015 Reported by
House Judiciary09/17/2015 Referred to
09/26/2016 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations10/05/2015 Referred to
Senate Judiciary09/27/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3537. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/2016)

Dangerous Synthetic Drug Control Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to add certain synthetic opioids, hallucinogens, and cannabinoids to schedule I. (A schedule I controlled substance is a drug, substance, or chemical that: has a high potential for abuse; has no currently accepted medical value; and is subject to regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties under the Controlled Substances Act.)