There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Big Cat Public Safety Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to clarify provisions enacted by the Captive Wildlife Safety Act, to further the conservation of certain wildlife species, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/17/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/06/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/17/2015Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (95)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/17/2015
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 09/17/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/18/2015
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 10/09/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/09/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/09/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/09/2015
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/27/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/27/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/27/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/27/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 10/27/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/02/2015
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/02/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/02/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/02/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/16/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/16/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/16/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/16/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/18/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/18/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 12/18/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/18/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/18/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/18/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/18/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/18/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/18/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/18/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/18/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/18/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/18/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/18/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/18/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/18/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/18/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 12/18/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/18/2015
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 12/18/2015
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 01/13/2016
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/13/2016
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/13/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/01/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/01/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/09/2016
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/09/2016
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/09/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/09/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/09/2016
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/09/2016
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/12/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/25/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/15/2016
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/15/2016
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/15/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/22/2016
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/13/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/13/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/13/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/13/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/20/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/20/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/29/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/12/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 06/13/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/21/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/06/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/06/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/06/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/06/2016
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/06/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/06/2016
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/06/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/13/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/06/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/06/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/06/2016
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/06/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/06/2016
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/06/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/08/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/21/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 09/21/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/28/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/28/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources09/17/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands10/06/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3546. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/17/2015)

Big Cat Public Safety Act

This bill amends the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to prohibit any person from breeding or possessing any live animal of any prohibited wildlife species (i.e., any live species of lion, tiger, leopard, cheetah, jaguar, or cougar or any hybrid of such species). Breeding means facilitating propagation or reproduction (whether intentionally or negligently), or failing to prevent propagation or reproduction. The bill extends forfeiture provisions to fish, wildlife, or plants that are bred or possessed.

The bill revises the list of entities that are exempt from Lacey Act prohibitions to include:

  • institutions accredited by the Association of Zoos and Aquariums;
  • certain facilities that have an active written contract with an Association of Zoos and Aquariums Species Survival Plan or Taxon Advisory Group for breeding prohibited wildlife species;
  • persons who do not allow the transportation and display of prohibited wildlife species off-site;
  • current owners of animals that were born before this bill's enactment if the animals are registered with the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service within 180 days; and
  • certain traveling circuses that hold Class C licenses under the Animal Welfare Act.

Entities exempt from Lacey Act prohibitions must require that current owners and circuses not allow direct contact between the public and the prohibited wildlife species.