There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Refugee Resettlement Oversight and Security Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to require the enactment into law of a joint resolution approving the number of refugees who may be admitted in any fiscal year, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/18/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/05/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/18/2015 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (105)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 09/18/2015
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 09/22/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/22/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/25/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/28/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/28/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/29/2015
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/29/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/29/2015
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 09/29/2015
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 09/30/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 10/01/2015
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/05/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 10/06/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 10/07/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/08/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 10/09/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/20/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/21/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/23/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/23/2015
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 10/26/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/16/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 11/16/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/16/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/16/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/16/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/16/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 11/16/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/16/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 11/16/2015
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 11/16/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 11/16/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/16/2015
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/16/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/16/2015
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 11/16/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/16/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 11/16/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 11/16/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/16/2015
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/16/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 11/16/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 11/16/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/16/2015
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 11/16/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/16/2015
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/16/2015
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 11/16/2015
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/17/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/17/2015
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/17/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/17/2015
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/17/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 11/17/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 11/17/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/17/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/17/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/17/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/17/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/17/2015
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 11/17/2015
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 11/17/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 11/17/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/17/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/17/2015
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 11/17/2015
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 11/17/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/17/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/17/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/17/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/17/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/17/2015
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/17/2015
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/17/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/17/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 11/17/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 11/18/2015
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/18/2015
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 11/18/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/18/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/18/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/18/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/18/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/18/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/18/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/18/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/18/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/18/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/19/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/06/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/18/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security10/05/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.3573.

Subjects (11)

  • Border security and unlawful immigration
  • Congressional oversight
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Immigration status and procedures
  • Iraq
  • Middle East
  • Racial and ethnic relations
  • Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
  • Religion
  • Syria

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3573. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/18/2015)

Refugee Resettlement Oversight and Security Act of 2015

This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to require the President, after appropriate consultation with certain congressional committees, to recommend to Congress the number of refugees who may be admitted into the United States in a fiscal year.

Except in the case of an unforeseen emergency refugee situation, no refugees may be admitted in a fiscal year until Congress enacts a joint resolution setting the number of refugees who may be admitted in that fiscal year.

In determining an alien's admissibility on security and related grounds the Department of Homeland Security shall consult with the Director of National Intelligence and the Federal Bureau of Investigation.

Beginning in FY2016 and ending in FY2020, the President, when considering the admission of refugees who are nationals or citizens of Iraq or Syria, shall give priority to members of a persecuted religious minority.

The Government Accountability Office shall report to Congress on the effectiveness of the refugee screening process in protecting U.S. security.