There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Universal Prekindergarten and Early Childhood Education Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a grant program to assist States to establish or expand universal prekindergarten in public schools and public charter schools.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/24/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/23/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
09/24/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/24/2015Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1352)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/24/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/11/2016
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/11/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/11/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/13/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/15/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/26/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce09/24/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education03/23/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3604.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3604. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/24/2015)

Universal Prekindergarten and Early Childhood Education Act of 2015

This bill authorizes through FY2021 a competitive grant program for states to establish or expand full-day prekindergarten programs that: (1) permit each three- or four-year old child in the state to be voluntarily enrolled by the child's parent, regardless of income, in the program at the public school in which the child would be enrolled for kindergarten; (2) run the length of the regular school year; and (3) are taught by teachers who possess equivalent or similar qualifications to those of teachers of other grades in the school.

The federal share of such a grant shall not exceed 80% of the costs of carrying out these activities. Grant funds received under the program shall be used to supplement and not supplant other federal early childhood education funds in the state.