There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mental Health Awareness Semipostal Stamp Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the issuance of a Mental Health Awareness Semipostal Stamp.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/29/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
10/02/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/29/2015Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/2015Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/2015Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 09/29/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 09/29/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/29/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/29/2015
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 09/29/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/01/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/01/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/01/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/01/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 10/07/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/08/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 10/09/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 10/16/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/16/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/16/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/16/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/16/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 10/16/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/16/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/16/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/16/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/16/2015
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/16/2015
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/16/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/16/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 10/16/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/20/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/20/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/23/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 12/01/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/09/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 12/10/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 12/18/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/12/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/01/2016
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/03/2016
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/03/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/17/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/06/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform09/29/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce09/29/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/02/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3640.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3640. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/29/2015)

Mental Health Awareness Semipostal Stamp Act

This bill directs the United States Postal Service to issue and sell, at a premium, a Mental Health Awareness Semipostal Stamp. Use of this stamp must be voluntary for postal patrons.

Proceeds from the sale of this stamp must be transferred to the National Institute of Mental Health to help fund mental illness research and suicide prevention programs.

The stamp must be available to the public for at least six years.