There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

State National Forest Management Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize States to select and acquire certain National Forest System lands to be managed and operated by the State for timber production and other purposes under the laws of the State, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/29/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date
06/15/2016Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/15/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/14/2016Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/14/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/14/2016Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/25/2016Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
10/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/15/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
09/29/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources09/29/2015 Referred to
06/15/2016 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands10/16/2015 Referred to
02/25/2016 Hearings by
06/14/2016 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources10/16/2015 Referred to
06/14/2016 Discharged from
House Agriculture09/29/2015 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry10/15/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3650.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3650. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/29/2015)

State National Forest Management Act of 2015

This bill directs the Department of Agriculture, through the Forest Service, to convey to a state up to 2 million acres of eligible portions of the National Forest System (NFS) in it that it elects to acquire through enactment by the state legislature of a bill meeting certain criteria.

Portions of the NFS conveyed to a state shall be administered and managed primarily for timber production.