There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

GEDI Act
Gestational Diabetes Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide grants to better understand and reduce gestational diabetes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/30/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/02/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/30/2015Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/30/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/30/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/05/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/16/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/28/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/09/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce09/30/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/02/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3658. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/30/2015)

Gestational Diabetes Act of 2015 or the GEDI Act

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to develop a multisite gestational diabetes research project within the diabetes program of the CDC to expand and enhance surveillance data and public health research on gestational diabetes. 

The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must expand and intensify public health research on gestational diabetes, including; (1) developing and testing novel approaches for improving postpartum testing or screening and for preventing type 2 diabetes in women with a history of gestational diabetes, and (2) conducting research to further understanding of the factors and health systems that influence the risk of gestational diabetes and the development of type 2 diabetes in women with a history of gestational diabetes.

The CDC must: (1) award grants for demonstration projects to reduce the incidence of gestational diabetes, the recurrence of such disease in subsequent pregnancies, and the development of type 2 diabetes in women with a history of gestational diabetes; and (2) work with state and Indian tribal-based diabetes prevention and control programs assisted by the CDC to encourage postpartum follow-up after gestational diabetes to reduce the incidence of gestational diabetes and its recurrence, the development of type 2 diabetes in at-risk women, and related complications.