There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Scleroderma and Fibrosis Research Enhancement Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To coordinate and advance fibrosis research activities at the National Institutes of Health, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/01/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/02/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/01/2015Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/01/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 10/01/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 10/01/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/01/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 10/01/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/02/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/06/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/08/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/08/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/08/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/09/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/20/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 10/20/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/20/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/21/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/21/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/21/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 10/21/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/28/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/28/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/28/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/03/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/16/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/01/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/11/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/15/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/12/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/23/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/14/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/10/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/16/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/10/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/10/2016
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/14/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/15/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/07/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/08/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/09/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/14/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/22/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/22/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 09/22/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/22/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 09/28/2016
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 09/28/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/15/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/15/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/15/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/29/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/08/2016
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/08/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/12/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/01/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/02/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3666. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/01/2015)

Scleroderma and Fibrosis Research Enhancement Act of 2015

This bill requires the National Institute of Arthritis and Musculoskeletal and Skin Diseases (NIAMS) to establish the National Commission on Scleroderma and Fibrosis Research. (Scleroderma and fibrosis are connective tissue conditions that cause hardening or scarring of skin and organs.)

The commission must develop a long-term, comprehensive plan for scleroderma and fibrosis research. The plan must: (1) prioritize research that has cross-cutting value and requires coordination across NIH, and (2) include specific steps for implementation of the research.

The commission must establish working groups to make research recommendations for the various organs and systems impacted by fibrotic illness.

The commission must be terminated not later than two years after establishment.

The NIAMS must create the Scleroderma and Fibrosis Working Group to oversee and assist with implementation of the long-term plan.