There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Access to Marketplace Insurance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to allow for certain third party payments.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/09/2015Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/09/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (146)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/23/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 11/02/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/02/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/02/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/01/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/01/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 12/08/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/08/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/08/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/08/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/08/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 12/15/2015
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/05/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/06/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 01/06/2016
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 02/01/2016
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 02/01/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/01/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/01/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 02/11/2016
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 02/11/2016
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 02/11/2016
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/11/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 02/11/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/25/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/25/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/01/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/01/2016
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/01/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/01/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/15/2016
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/15/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/15/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/15/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/15/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/15/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/15/2016
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/18/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/27/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/27/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 04/27/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 04/27/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 04/27/2016
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/28/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/28/2016
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/29/2016
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/11/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/11/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/16/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/16/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2016
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/16/2016
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 05/16/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/16/2016
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/16/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/18/2016
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/18/2016
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/18/2016
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 05/23/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/25/2016
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 05/25/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/27/2016
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/27/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/27/2016
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/07/2016
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/07/2016
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/10/2016
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/10/2016
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 06/24/2016
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/24/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/24/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/24/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/24/2016
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/05/2016
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/05/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/05/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/06/2016
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/06/2016
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/06/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/08/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/12/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/12/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/13/2016
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/13/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/13/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/14/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/14/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 07/14/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/14/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/14/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 07/14/2016
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/18/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/08/2016
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/08/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/08/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 09/08/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/08/2016
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 09/08/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/08/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/08/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/09/2016
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 09/12/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/12/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 09/12/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/12/2016
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4] 09/20/2016
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/20/2016
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/20/2016
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/20/2016
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 09/20/2016
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 09/22/2016
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/22/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/22/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/22/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/26/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 09/26/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/26/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/28/2016
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/28/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/28/2016
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/28/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 11/14/2016
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/14/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/14/2016
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/14/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/14/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 11/14/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/14/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 11/14/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/14/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 11/14/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 11/14/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/14/2016
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/02/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/02/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/08/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/08/2016
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 12/08/2016
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/08/2016
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/08/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/09/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/16/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3742.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3742. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/09/2015)

Access to Marketplace Insurance Act

This bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to require health insurers to accept, on behalf of individuals enrolled in qualified health plans, payments made by certain third parties, including state and federal government programs, Indian tribes, tribal organizations, urban Indian organizations, and certain tax exempt organizations. (Qualified health plans are eligible for subsidies and fulfill an individual's requirement to maintain minimum essential coverage.)