There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Venezuelan Refugee Assistance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To adjust the immigration status of certain Venezuelan nationals who are in the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/03/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/09/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/09/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 10/09/2015
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/09/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 10/09/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 10/20/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/29/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary10/09/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security11/03/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3744.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3744. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/09/2015)

Venezuelan Refugee Assistance Act

This bill provides for the status adjustment to permanent resident of a qualifying Venezuelan national who: (1) was physically present in the United States on January 1, 2013, (2) has been physically present in the United States for at least one year and is physically present in the United States on the date the status adjustment application is filed, (3) has not been convicted of specified crimes and was never involved in the persecution of others, and (4) applies for adjustment before January 1, 2019.

Derivative adjustment of status is provided for the spouse, child, or certain unmarried sons or daughters of such alien.