There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3764. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (12/07/2016)

TITLE I--FEDERAL RECOGNITION OF INDIAN TRIBES, GENERALLY

Tribal Recognition Act of 2016

(Sec. 104) This bill replaces the process for federal recognition of Indian tribes. Indian groups may only be recognized as an Indian tribe by Congress. Groups that are not federally recognized may submit a petition for federal recognition to the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA) and may file a letter of intent in advance. Groups may not be factions of recognized Indian tribes and may not have been denied federal recognition.

(Sec. 106) The BIA must publish guidelines for the preparation of petitions and provide petitioners with suggestions and advice.

(Sec. 107) The bill specifies criteria for a group to be considered an Indian tribe, including that the group has been identified as an Indian entity on a substantially continuous basis since 1900, comprises a distinct community, and consists of individuals who descend from a historical Indian tribe. Previous federal recognition is acceptable evidence of the tribal character of a group to the date of the last such recognition.

(Sec. 109) The BIA must: (1) notify the group, the state in which the group is located, any tribes or petitioning groups that are related to or have a potential interest in the group, and the public of the receipt of a letter of intent or a petition; (2) conduct a preliminary review of a petition and notify the group of obvious deficiencies or significant omissions and provide the group with an opportunity to revise the petition; and (3) review each petition and may initiate additional research before reporting on the petition to Congress.

TITLE II--FEDERAL RECOGNITION OF VIRGINIA INDIAN TRIBES

Thomasina E. Jordan Indian Tribes of Virginia Federal Recognition Act of 2016

(Sec. 213) This bill extends federal recognition to the following Indian tribes of Virginia and establishes their relationship with the federal government:

  • the Chickahominy Tribe;
  • the Chickahominy Indian Tribe--Eastern Division;
  • the Upper Mattaponi Tribe;
  • the Rappahannock Tribe, Inc.;
  • the Monacan Indian Nation; and
  • the Nansemond Indian Tribe.

The tribes and their members are made eligible for all services and benefits provided by the federal government to federally recognized Indian tribes. The bill establishes the service area of each tribe and requirements for each tribe regarding its membership roll and governance.

(Sec. 216) Upon the request of a tribe, the Department of the Interior must take specified lands into trust for the benefit of the tribe, to be considered part of the tribe's reservation.

The tribes may not conduct gaming activities.

TITLE III--LITTLE SHELL TRIBE OF CHIPPEWA INDIANS

Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians Restoration Act of 2016

(Sec. 304) This bill extends federal recognition to the Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians of Montana.

(Sec. 305) The tribe and its members become eligible for services and benefits provided by the United States to federally recognized tribes and their members, without regard to the existence of a reservation or the location of the residence of any member. The service area of the tribe is considered to be the area comprised of Blaine, Cascade, Glacier, and Hill Counties, Montana.

(Sec. 307) The tribe, as a condition of receiving recognition, services, and benefits, must submit to Interior, and maintain, a membership roll.

(Sec. 308) Interior must take into trust for the benefit of the tribe 200 acres of land within the tribe's service area to be used for a tribal land base.

Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/07/2016 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-847.
10/20/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
12/07/2016 Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 663.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/07/2016 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-847.
Action By: House Natural Resources
09/08/2016 Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 13.
Action By: House Natural Resources
09/08/2016 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Natural Resources
09/07/2016 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Natural Resources
09/07/2016 Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
Action By: House Natural Resources
12/08/2015 Subcommittee Hearings Held (Part II).
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs
10/28/2015 Subcommittee Hearings Held (Part I).
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs
10/23/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: House Natural Resources
10/20/2015 Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/20/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (3)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House:

Tribal Recognition Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced:

Tribal Recognition Act of 2015

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To provide that an Indian group may receive Federal acknowledgment as an Indian tribe only by an Act of Congress, and for other purposes.


Subjects (3)

  • Federal-Indian relations
  • General Native American affairs matters

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 10/22/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/01/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources10/20/2015 Referred to
09/08/2016 Markup by
12/07/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-847
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs10/23/2015 Referred to
12/08/2015 Hearings by
09/07/2016 Discharged from

Related Bills (4)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.