There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hearing Protection Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that silencers be treated the same as long guns.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/22/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
11/23/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/22/2015 Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/2015 Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/2015 Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 10/22/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/22/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 10/22/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 10/22/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 10/22/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 10/22/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 10/22/2015
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 10/22/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 10/22/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 10/22/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/23/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 10/23/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/27/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 10/27/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 10/27/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 10/27/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 10/28/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/02/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/02/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 11/02/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 11/02/2015
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/03/2015
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 11/16/2015
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/16/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 11/17/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/19/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/19/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 12/02/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 12/02/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 12/02/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/07/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/07/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/07/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/10/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/11/2015
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 12/17/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 12/18/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 12/18/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/06/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/06/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/06/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 01/06/2016
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 02/01/2016
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/01/2016
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/01/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/01/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/08/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/23/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 02/23/2016
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/14/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/15/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/22/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 04/12/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 04/12/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/18/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/27/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/10/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/10/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/10/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/10/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/10/2016
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 05/11/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/11/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/11/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/12/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/12/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/13/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/13/2016
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/17/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/07/2016
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/07/2016
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 06/08/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/12/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 09/15/2016
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/14/2016
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/14/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 11/30/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means10/22/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary10/22/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations11/23/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Federal preemption
  • Firearms and explosives
  • Licensing and registrations
  • Sales and excise taxes
  • State and local taxation

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3799. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/22/2015)

Hearing Protection Act of 2015

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) eliminate the $200 transfer tax on firearm silencers, and (2) treat any person who acquires or possesses a firearm silencer as meeting any registration or licensing requirements of the National Firearms Act with respect to such silencer. Any person who pays a tax on a silencer after October 22, 2015 may receive a refund of such tax.

The bill amends the federal criminal code to preempt state or local laws that tax or regulate firearm silencers.