There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Bureau of Land Management Foundation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Bureau of Land Management Foundation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Energy and Minerals Reclamation Foundation Establishment Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To establish the Bureau of Land Management Foundation to encourage, obtain, and use gifts, devises, and bequests for projects for the benefit of, or in connection with, activities and services of the Bureau of Land Management, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Energy and Minerals Reclamation Foundation to encourage, obtain, and use gifts, devises, and bequests for projects to reclaim abandoned mine lands and orphan oil and gas well sites, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/05/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4246-4248)
07/01/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-651.
10/28/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/06/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/05/2016-7:56pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/05/2016-7:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/05/2016-7:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4246-4248)
07/05/2016-7:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3844.
07/05/2016-7:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4246-4248)
07/05/2016-7:49pmHouseMr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/01/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 503.
07/01/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-651.
06/15/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/15/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/14/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/14/2016HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
11/04/2015HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
10/28/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/28/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
10/28/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/13/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources10/28/2015 Referred to
06/15/2016 Markup by
07/01/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-651
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources10/28/2015 Referred to
11/04/2015 Hearings by
06/14/2016 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/06/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3844. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/05/2016)

Bureau of Land Management Foundation Act

(Sec. 3) This bill establishes the Bureau of Land Management Foundation as a charitable, nonprofit organization to encourage, accept, obtain, administer, and use private gifts of money, devises, and bequests of real and personal property for the benefit of, or in connection with, the activities and services of the Bureau of Land Management (BLM).

The foundation shall conduct and encourage programs and activities that support:

  • educational, technical, scientific, and other assistance or activities to support the management of BLM lands with regard to wild free-roaming horses and burros, fish and wildlife and their habitats, National Conservation Lands, and recreation, cultural, and historic resources; and
  • activities that support the reclamation and remediation of specified abandoned mine lands, specified orphaned oil and gas well sites, or public lands impacted by development connected to mineral exploration and development activities.

Reclamation activities are to include the remediation of soil and water contamination; the restoration of wildlife habitat in order to restore the natural, scenic, historic, cultural, and ecological values of those areas; or promotion of the areas' economic potential.