There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Strengthening Cybersecurity Information Sharing and Coordination in Our Ports Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Strengthening Cybersecurity Information Sharing and Coordination in Our Ports Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Strengthening Cybersecurity Information Sharing and Coordination in Our Ports Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance cybersecurity information sharing and coordination at ports in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/16/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9353)
12/15/2015Committee on Transportation discharged.
12/15/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-379, Part I.
11/02/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
02/01/2016SenateStar Print ordered on the bill.
12/17/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/16/2015-12:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2015-12:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9353)
12/16/2015-12:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3878.
12/16/2015-12:25pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9352-9355)
12/16/2015-12:25pmHouseMrs. Miller (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/15/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 288.
12/15/2015HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
12/15/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-379, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/04/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/04/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/02/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/02/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/02/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/02/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/05/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/01/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/01/2015

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security11/02/2015 Referred to
11/04/2015 Markup by
12/15/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-379
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/02/2015 Referred to
12/15/2015 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/17/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3878. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/16/2015)

Strengthening Cybersecurity Information Sharing and Coordination in Our Ports Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to implement, and evaluate at least every two years, a maritime cybersecurity risk assessment model to evaluate current and future cybersecurity risks. The model must be consistent with the National Institute of Standards and Technology Framework for Improving Critical Infrastructure Cybersecurity and any updates pursuant to the Cybersecurity Enhancement Act of 2014.

DHS must also: (1) seek to ensure participation of at least one information sharing and analysis organization representing the maritime community in the National Cybersecurity and Communications Integration Center (NCCIC); (2) establish guidelines for voluntary reporting of maritime-related cybersecurity risks and incidents to the NCCIC and other appropriate federal agencies; and (3) request the National Maritime Security Advisory Committee to report and make recommendations to DHS regarding the enhancement of cybersecurity information sharing between relevant federal agencies and state, local, and tribal governments, public safety and emergency response agencies, law enforcement and security organizations, the maritime industry, port owners and operators, and terminal owners and operators.

(Sec. 3) The Coast Guard must: (1) direct Area Maritime Security Advisory Committees to facilitate the sharing of cybersecurity risks and incidents to address port-specific cybersecurity risks, including, possibly, by establishing a working group of members of such committees to address port-specific cybersecurity vulnerabilities; and (2) require area maritime security plans and facility security plans to include a mitigation plan to prevent, manage, and respond to cybersecurity risks.

(Sec. 4) DHS's vulnerability assessments of facilities and vessels that may be involved in a transportation security incident must identify weaknesses in cybersecurity. Owners or operators of such vessels or facilities must include provisions regarding prevention, management, and response to cybersecurity risks in their security plans for deterring such incidents.