There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Early Childhood Nutrition Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to improve the child and adult care food program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/03/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/23/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
11/03/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/03/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 11/03/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 11/05/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/17/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/17/2015
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/10/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/10/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/10/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 12/10/2015
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/10/2015
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/10/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/10/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/10/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/10/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/15/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/15/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/15/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/18/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/18/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/18/2015
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 01/08/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 01/12/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/01/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/01/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/01/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/11/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/11/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/02/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/14/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/11/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/11/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/14/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/15/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/07/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/12/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/13/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/14/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/14/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/18/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/21/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/21/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/06/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/06/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/06/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/06/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/13/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/15/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 09/21/2016
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/21/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/21/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/21/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/21/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/21/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/21/2016
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/21/2016
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/21/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/22/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/22/2016
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/22/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/22/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/26/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/28/2016
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/28/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 11/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce11/03/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education03/23/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3886.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3886. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/03/2015)

Early Childhood Nutrition Improvement Act

This bill amends the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to revise several provisions related to the child and adult care food program.

Under current law: (1) an institution that provides child or day care under the program may be reimbursed for up to two meals and one supplement per day per child; and (2) a family or group day care home sponsoring organization may receive the same maximum reimbursement, but only with respect to a child maintained in a child care setting for at least eight hours per day. The bill eliminates this distinction between institutions and sponsoring organizations, and increases maximum reimbursement for both to: (1) two meals and one supplement or one meal and two supplements per day per child; or (2) three meals and one supplement or two meals and two supplements per day per child, for each child maintained in a child care setting for at least eight hours per day.

A determination of a for-profit day care center's eligibility to participate in the program shall be in effect for six months.

The Department of Agriculture (USDA) must issue guidance and, as appropriate, regulations to assist in ensuring a fair and effective process for the identification, review, and correction of serious program deficiencies.

USDA shall establish an advisory committee to examine the feasibility of reducing unnecessary or duplicative paperwork for those participating or seeking to participate in the program.