There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3892. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/03/2015)

Muslim Brotherhood Terrorist Designation Act of 2015

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the Muslim Brotherhood has met the criteria for designation as a foreign terrorist organization, and (2) the Department of State should so designate it.

Requires the State Department to report to Congress within 60 days whether the Muslim Brotherhood meets the criteria for foreign terrorist designation and, if not, which criteria have not been met.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/03/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/24/2016 Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 10.
Action By: House Judiciary
02/24/2016 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Judiciary
02/19/2016 Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security Discharged.
Action By: House Judiciary
12/04/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: House Judiciary
11/03/2015 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/03/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Muslim Brotherhood Terrorist Designation Act of 2015

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To require the Secretary of State to submit a report to Congress on the designation of the Muslim Brotherhood as a foreign terrorist organization, and for other purposes.


Subjects (4)

  • Congressional oversight
  • Middle East
  • Terrorism

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/03/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 11/03/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 11/03/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 11/03/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 11/17/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/17/2015
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/09/2015
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/09/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/09/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 12/09/2015
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 12/17/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/17/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/06/2016
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 01/06/2016
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 02/01/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/01/2016
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 02/01/2016
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 02/01/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 02/01/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/10/2016
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/10/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/10/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/23/2016
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/23/2016
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/23/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/23/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/23/2016
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/23/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/26/2016
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/26/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/14/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/14/2016
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/14/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/14/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/14/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/16/2016
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 03/16/2016
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/17/2016
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/12/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 04/12/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/12/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/14/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/14/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/20/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/20/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 04/20/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/29/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/12/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/12/2016
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/12/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/12/2016
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/18/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/18/2016
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/18/2016
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/03/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/07/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 06/07/2016
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/16/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/22/2016
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 06/22/2016
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/12/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/13/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/21/2016
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/21/2016
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/22/2016
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/28/2016
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/06/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 12/06/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 12/20/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/03/2015 Referred to
02/24/2016 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security12/04/2015 Referred to
02/19/2016 Discharged from

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.