There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Global Development Lab Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Development Lab Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish in the United States Agency for International Development an entity to be known as the United States Global Development Lab, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/21/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5787-5788)
11/04/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/22/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/21/2016-8:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2016-8:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5787-5788)
09/21/2016-8:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3924.
09/21/2016-8:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5787-5789)
09/21/2016-8:29pmHouseMr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/24/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/24/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
11/04/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
11/04/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/04/2015
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/23/2016
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/19/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/20/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/04/2015 Referred to
02/24/2016 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations09/22/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3924.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3924. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/21/2016)

Global Development Lab Act of 2016

(Sec. 3) This bill establishes in the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) the United States Global Development Lab, the duties of which shall include:

  • increasing the application of science, technology, innovation, and partnerships to develop new solutions to end extreme poverty;
  • discovering and testing innovations to increase cost effectiveness and support U.S. foreign policy and development goals;
  • leveraging the expertise and resources of businesses, nongovernmental organizations, science and research organizations, and universities to increase program impact; and
  • supporting USAID missions and bureaus in applying science, technology, innovation, and partnership approaches to decision making, procurement, and program design.

USAID may (1) provide innovation incentive awards; and (2) use certain funds for each of FY2017-FY2021 to employ up to 30 individuals on a limited term basis.

(Sec. 4) "Innovation incentive award" means the provision of funding on a competitive basis that: (1) encourages the development of solutions for a particular, well-defined problem relating to the alleviation of poverty; or (2) helps identify and promote a broad range of ideas and practices facilitating third party development of an idea or practice.