There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the building utilized as a United States courthouse located at 150 Reade Circle in Greenville, North Carolina, as the "Randy D. Doub United States Courthouse".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the building utilized as a United States courthouse located at 150 Reade Circle in Greenville, North Carolina, as the "Judge Randy D. Doub United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/07/2016Became Public Law No: 114-234. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2016Signed by President.
10/03/2016Presented to President.
09/29/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2016Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/20/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5702)
03/23/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-464.
11/05/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/07/2016Became Public Law No: 114-234. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2016Signed by President.
10/03/2016HousePresented to President.
09/29/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2016SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/21/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (consideration: CR S6255)
09/20/2016-8:00pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/20/2016-8:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/20/2016-8:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5702)
09/20/2016-7:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3937.
09/20/2016-7:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5702-5703)
09/20/2016-7:49pmHouseMr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/23/2016HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 100.
03/23/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-464.
03/02/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/02/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/02/2016HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
11/06/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/05/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
11/05/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/05/2015 Referred to
03/02/2016 Markup by
03/23/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-464
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management11/06/2015 Referred to
03/02/2016 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works09/21/2016 Referred to
09/29/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3937. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-234 (10/07/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on March 23, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This bill designates the building utilized as a U.S. courthouse located at 150 Reade Circle in Greenville, North Carolina, as the "Randy D. Doub United States Courthouse" during the period in which the building is so utilized.