There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4122 Madison Street, Elfers, Florida, as the "Private First Class Felton Roger Fussell Memorial Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-203. (TXT | PDF)
07/29/2016Signed by President.
07/19/2016Presented to President.
07/14/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/2016Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5192-5193)
05/23/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2923)
11/05/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-203. (TXT | PDF)
07/29/2016Signed by President.
07/19/2016HousePresented to President.
07/15/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/14/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/2016SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5192-5193)
05/24/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/23/2016-5:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2016-5:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2923)
05/23/2016-5:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3953.
05/23/2016-5:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2923)
05/23/2016-5:36pmHouseMr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/17/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/17/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/05/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
11/05/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform11/05/2015 Referred to
05/17/2016 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/24/2016 Referred to
07/14/2016 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3953.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3953. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-203 (07/29/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4122 Madison Street, Elfers, Florida, as the "Private First Class Felton Roger Fussell Memorial Post Office."