There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Laughlin, Nevada, as the "Master Chief Petty Officer Jesse Dean VA Clinic".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Laughlin, Nevada, as the "Master Chief Petty Officer Jesse Dean Department of Veterans Affairs Community-Based Outpatient Clinic".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
09/23/2016Became Public Law No: 114-220. (TXT | PDF)
09/23/2016Signed by President.
09/14/2016Presented to President.
09/08/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/08/2016Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5482)
05/23/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2931)
11/05/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
09/23/2016Became Public Law No: 114-220. (TXT | PDF)
09/23/2016Signed by President.
09/14/2016HousePresented to President.
09/09/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/08/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/08/2016SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5482)
05/24/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/23/2016-7:19pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2016-7:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2016-7:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2931)
05/23/2016-7:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3969.
05/23/2016-7:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2931-2932)
05/23/2016-7:11pmHouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/03/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/05/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/05/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 11/05/2015
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4]* 11/05/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs11/05/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health12/03/2015 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/24/2016 Referred to
09/08/2016 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3969.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3969. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-220 (09/23/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on May 23, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Laughlin, Nevada, as the "Master Chief Petty Officer Jesse Dean VA Clinic."