There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Securing Access to Networks in Disasters Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing Access to Networks in Disasters Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To direct the Federal Communications Commission to conduct a study on network resiliency during times of emergency, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Federal Communications Commission to commence proceedings related to the resiliency of critical telecommunications networks during times of emergency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
05/23/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 2 (Roll no. 230).(text: CR H2890)
05/23/2016Committee on Transportation discharged.
05/23/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-583, Part I.
11/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/24/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
05/23/2016-7:04pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2016-7:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2016-7:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 2 (Roll no. 230). (text: CR H2890)
05/23/2016-6:58pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2930)
05/23/2016-2:53pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/23/2016-2:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3998.
05/23/2016-2:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2890-2891)
05/23/2016-2:46pmHouseMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/23/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 453.
05/23/2016HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
05/23/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-583, Part I.
04/28/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/28/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/27/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/26/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/25/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/19/2016HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
04/19/2016HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
04/18/2016HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
11/20/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/17/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/16/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/16/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/16/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/16/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/12/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/12/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 01/12/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/09/2016

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce11/16/2015 Referred to
04/28/2016 Markup by
05/23/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-583
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology11/20/2015 Referred to
04/19/2016 Markup by
04/19/2016 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/16/2015 Referred to
05/23/2016 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management11/17/2015 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/24/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3998. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/23/2016)

Securing Access to Networks in Disasters Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to submit to Congress and publish on the FCC website a study on the public safety benefits, technical feasibility, and cost of providing the public with access to 9-1-1 services during times of emergency when mobile service is unavailable, through:

  • telecommunications service provider-owned WiFi access points and other communications technologies operating on unlicensed spectrum, without requiring any login credentials;
  • non-telecommunications service provider-owned WiFi access points; and
  • other alternative means.

The types of emergencies subject to this bill are: (1) occasions or instances under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act for which the President determines that federal assistance is needed to supplement state and local efforts and capabilities to save lives and to protect property and public health and safety, or to lessen or avert the threat of a catastrophe in any part of the United States; or (2) an emergency declared by the governor of a state or U.S. territory.

(Sec. 3) The Stafford Act is amended to expand the categories of essential service providers that may access a disaster site to restore and repair essential services in an emergency or major disaster without being denied or impeded by a federal agency. Services to be considered essential are wireline or mobile telephone service, Internet access service, radio or television broadcasting, cable service, or direct broadcast satellite service.