There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Secure Fence Restoration Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • National Security and Federal Lands Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require fencing along and operational control of the southwest border, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/17/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
11/30/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/23/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/17/2015Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/17/2015Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/17/2015Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/17/2015Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/17/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/28/2016
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/11/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/11/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 07/11/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/18/2016

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security11/17/2015 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security11/30/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources11/17/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands11/23/2015 Referred to
House Agriculture11/17/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4034. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/17/2015)

Secure Fence Restoration Act of 2015

This bill amends the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 with respect to construction of border fencing and road improvements to direct the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to complete the required 700-mile southwest border fencing and priority-area fencing by December 31, 2017.

The Secure Fence Act of 2006 is amended to direct DHS, in consultation with state and local officials along the U.S.-Mexico border, to achieve operational control over U.S. international land and maritime borders by December 31, 2017.

National Security and Federal Lands Protection Act

Neither the Department of the Interior nor the Department of Agriculture may prohibit or restrict U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) activities on federal land under their respective jurisdictions within 100 miles of an international land border to:

  • execute search and rescue operations; and
  • prevent unlawful entries into the United States, including entries by terrorists, other unlawful aliens, instruments of terrorism, narcotics, and other contraband through such border.

CBP shall have access to such lands to conduct: (1) road and barrier construction and maintenance, (2) vehicular patrols, (3) surveillance activities, and (4) deployment of temporary tactical infrastructure.