There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hygiene Assistance for Families of Infants and Toddlers Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title IV of the Social Security Act to address the increased burden that maintaining the health and hygiene of infants and toddlers places on families in need, the resultant adverse health effects on children and families, and the limited child care options available for infants and toddlers who lack sufficient diapers, which prevents their parents and guardians from entering the workforce.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/18/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/18/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
11/18/2015Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/18/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/18/2015
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/01/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/01/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/01/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/01/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/01/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/08/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/11/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/11/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/11/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/15/2015
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/17/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/18/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/18/2015
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/01/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/08/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/02/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/10/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/14/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/11/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 04/11/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 04/12/2016
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/13/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/14/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/12/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/12/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/12/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/13/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/13/2016
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/13/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/25/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/14/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/21/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/06/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/08/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means11/18/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources11/18/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4055. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/18/2015)

Hygiene Assistance for Families of Infants and Toddlers Act of 2015

This bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services to make grants to states to conduct demonstration projects to implement and evaluate strategies to help families address the diapering supply needs of eligible children.

Title XI of the Social Security Act is amended to exempt diaper benefits from the territorial payment ceiling.