There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Protection Improvements Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Child Protection Act of 1993 to establish a permanent background check system.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/18/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/04/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/18/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/18/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/08/2015
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/05/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/11/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/13/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/25/2016
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/01/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/01/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/01/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/01/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/04/2016
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 02/04/2016
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/09/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 02/09/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/12/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/12/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 02/26/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/26/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 02/29/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/01/2016
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/01/2016
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/01/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/02/2016
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/02/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/15/2016
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/15/2016
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/15/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 03/17/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/17/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/17/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/23/2016
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 03/23/2016
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/23/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/12/2016
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/12/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/12/2016
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/12/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/15/2016
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 04/21/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/21/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/28/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/28/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/10/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/12/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/07/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/09/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/07/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/07/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/07/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/18/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations12/04/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4073. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/18/2015)

Child Protection Improvements Act of 2015

This bill amends the National Child Protection Act of 1993 to direct the Department of Justice to: (1) establish policies and procedures to streamline the process of obtaining national criminal history background checks on covered individuals, and (2) establish a criminal history review program to provide covered entities with reliable and accurate information on the criminal history of a covered individual.

It defines "covered entity" as any business or organization that provides, or licenses, certifies, or coordinates individuals or organizations to provide care, care placement, supervision, treatment, education, training, instruction, or recreation to vulnerable populations including elderly persons, disabled persons, and children.

It defines "covered individual" as an individual who: (1) has, seeks to have, or may have unsupervised access to vulnerable populations served by a covered entity; (2) is employed by or volunteers with, or seeks to be employed by or volunteer with, a covered entity; or (3) owns or operates, or seeks to own or operate, a covered entity.