There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to recoup relocation expenses paid to or on behalf of employees of the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/01/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
05/18/2016Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 4.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/18/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/11/2016Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 5 - 3 .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
05/11/2016Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/14/2016Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
12/03/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/01/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/01/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/01/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/01/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs12/01/2015 Referred to
05/18/2016 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity12/03/2015 Referred to
04/14/2016 Hearings by
05/11/2016 Markup by
05/11/2016 Reported by
House Oversight and Government Reform12/01/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4138. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/01/2015)

This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to direct a VA employee to repay all or part of the transferee relocation expenses paid to the employee if: (1) the VA determines such repayment is appropriate, and (2) the employee is afforded notice and opportunity for a hearing conducted by another federal department or agency before repayment.

A decision regarding employee repayment shall be final and may not be reviewed by any department, agency, or court.