There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Foreclosure Relief and Extension for Servicemembers Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend temporarily the extended period of protection for members of uniformed services relating to mortgages, mortgage foreclosure, and eviction, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/15/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
12/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/15/2015Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/15/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 12/15/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 12/15/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs12/15/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity12/16/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4252. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/15/2015)

Foreclosure Relief and Extension for Servicemembers Act of 2015

This bill amends the Honoring America's Veterans and Caring for Camp Lejeune Families Act of 2012 to extend through 2017 the one-year period after a service member's military service during which: (1) a court may stay proceedings to enforce an obligation on real or personal property owned by the service member before such military service; and (2) any sale, foreclosure, or seizure of such property shall be invalid without a court order or waiver agreement signed by the service member. (Currently, the extended one-year period is scheduled to expire on December 31, 2015, and return to a nine-month period under the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act.)

Effective January 1, 2018 (currently, January 1, 2016), the old nine-month period in place of the one-year period granted by such Act shall be restored.