There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Servicemember Higher Education Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect servicemembers in higher education, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/15/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
03/23/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
01/28/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
12/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/15/2015Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/15/2015Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/15/2015Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/15/2015Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/15/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 12/15/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 12/15/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/12/2016

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce12/15/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education03/23/2016 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs12/15/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity12/16/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services12/15/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel01/28/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4260.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4260. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/15/2015)

Servicemember Higher Education Protection Act

This bill amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to modify provisions related to student loans for members of the military and their spouses.

The Department of Education (ED) shall make available a simplified disclosure and enrollment form for student loan borrowers who are performing eligible military service.

The bill establishes, within the office of the Student Loan Ombudsman, a military and veteran point of contact.

The bill modifies processes for determining disability with respect to discharging a borrower's student loans. A borrower whose loan is discharged under these processes shall not be subject to certain reinstatement provisions.

Under current law, borrowers serving on active duty are eligible for certain student loan interest subsidies and deferment. The bill extends such eligibility to borrowers performing other specified military service and their spouses.

The bill specifies how lump sum payments made through eligible repayment programs shall be treated for purposes of determining a borrower's eligibility for public service loan forgiveness.

Without requiring a request from the borrower, ED must ensure that certain student loan interest does not accrue for an eligible military borrower serving in an area of hostilities.

With respect to the National Student Loan Data System, ED must: (1) integrate certain data related to the military and veteran status of borrowers, and (2) include information regarding Public Health Service loans.

ED shall use specified information to ensure that an active duty borrower is not charged interest in excess of a maximum rate on certain student loans.

The bill limits the allowable interest rate on certain student loan debt incurred during military service for the purpose of consolidating or refinancing student loans incurred before service.

The bill establishes a working group to improve resources available from the Department of Defense's tuition assistance programs.