There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Transparency and Accountability of Failed Exchanges Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title I of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to require that a State awarded a Federal grant to establish an Exchange and that terminates the State operation of such an Exchange provide for an audit of the use of grant funds and return funds to the Federal Government, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/18/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
12/16/2015Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/16/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 12/18/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/07/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/07/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/07/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/07/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/07/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/07/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/08/2016
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 01/08/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/12/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 01/13/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/01/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/01/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/03/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/03/2016
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/03/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/04/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 02/09/2016
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/10/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/11/2016
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/12/2016
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/23/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/23/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 02/24/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 02/24/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 02/24/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 02/25/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/26/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 02/26/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/01/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/01/2016
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 03/02/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/02/2016
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/02/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/02/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/02/2016
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/02/2016
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 03/15/2016
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 03/15/2016
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/16/2016
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/17/2016
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/17/2016
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 03/17/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/17/2016
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/12/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/12/2016
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/12/2016
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/12/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/18/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/28/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/29/2016
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/10/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/10/2016
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/12/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/12/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/18/2016
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/19/2016
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/24/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/08/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/08/2016
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/13/2016
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce12/16/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/18/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4262.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4262. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/16/2015)

Transparency and Accountability of Failed Exchanges Act

This bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) to require the Department of Health and Human Services, for certain states awarded a grant to establish a health insurance exchange, to report on how awarded amounts were used and rescind unobligated amounts. This applies to any state that terminates operation of its exchange or transfers operation to another entity. Such a state must provide to the General Services Administration any property acquired through the grant and refer matters involving fraud, waste, and abuse of funds issued pursuant to PPACA to the Department of Justice. Funds rescinded must be retained for federal budget deficit reduction.