There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

End EPA Advertising Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency from awarding contracts for public relations, market research, or other similar activities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
09/30/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
12/18/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
12/17/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
12/16/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/16/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/16/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/16/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/16/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/16/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 12/17/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 12/17/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 12/17/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/01/2016

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce12/16/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power12/18/2015 Referred to
House Agriculture12/16/2015 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/16/2015 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment12/17/2015 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology12/16/2015 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment09/30/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4271.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4271. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/16/2015)

End EPA Advertising Act

This bill prohibits the Environmental Protection Agency from awarding contracts for public relations, market research, or other similar activities.