There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Export American Natural Gas Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the expedited approval by the Secretary of Energy of liquefied natural gas exports, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/11/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
01/23/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 04/18/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/11/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/21/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power01/23/2015 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs01/21/2015 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade02/11/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.428.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.428. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/21/2015)

Export American Natural Gas Act of 2015

Amends the Natural Gas Act to direct the Secretary of Energy to either approve or deny an application to export liquefied natural gas (LNG), whether through an onshore or offshore terminal, within 60 days after the later of: (1) receiving a completed application; (2) the applicant's contracting with a customer for the LNG proposed to be exported, and (3) the date of the enactment of this Act.

Deems the application approved if the Secretary has neither approved nor denied it by such 60-day deadline.

Declares this Act inapplicable to applications for export to a nation to which export is prohibited by law.

Directs the Secretary of State to report to Congress on: (1) how the economic policies of foreign countries with natural gas resources and reserves relate to the development and production of their natural gas resources and reserves, as well as the extent and status of their natural gas resources and reserves; (2) the potential of such countries to export their natural gas production to the global market, including the impact of such exports upon the global market; and (3) U.S. actions to foster natural gas exports to foreign countries having an interest in importing natural gas from the United States.