There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

No Welfare for Terrorists Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to provide that certain convicted felons shall be ineligible to participate in the supplemental nutrition assistance program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/01/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/17/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/01/2016Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/01/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/03/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/03/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/03/2016
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/03/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/03/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 02/03/2016
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/03/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/03/2016
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/04/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 02/04/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/04/2016
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/04/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/04/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/04/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/04/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/04/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/04/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/04/2016
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/04/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/04/2016
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/04/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/08/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/08/2016
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/08/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 02/08/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/08/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/08/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/09/2016
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 02/09/2016
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/09/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 02/10/2016
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/10/2016
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/10/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 02/10/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/11/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/11/2016
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/11/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/12/2016
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/12/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/23/2016
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/23/2016
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/23/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/03/2016
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/01/2016 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Nutrition02/17/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4420.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4420. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/01/2016)

No Welfare for Terrorists Act of 2016

This bill amends the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to make convicted terrorists ineligible to participate in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP, formerly known as the food stamp program).