There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Aviation Innovation, Reform, and Reauthorization Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To transfer operation of air traffic services currently provided by the Federal Aviation Administration to a separate not-for-profit corporate entity, to reauthorize and streamline programs of the Federal Aviation Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/03/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/11/2016Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/11/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/04/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/03/2016Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/03/2016
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 02/12/2016
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 02/12/2016
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/12/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/12/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/03/2016 Referred to
02/11/2016 Markup by
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation02/04/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4441. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/2016)

Aviation Innovation, Reform, and Reauthorization Act of 2016

This bill reauthorizes the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) through FY2019 and specified FAA programs for FY2016-FY2022.

The bill revises requirements for the pilot program for passenger facility charges at nonhub airports and airport improvement program.

The bill establishes:

  • the ATC Corporation as a federally-chartered, not-for-profit corporation; and
  • an Advisory Board of the Corporation.

The Department of Transportation (DOT) shall transfer to the Corporation:

  • by a certain deadline FAA employees, property, and facilities; and
  • on October 1, 2019, operational control of FAA air traffic services.

DOT shall establish a Safety Oversight and Certification Advisory Committee.

The FAA shall issue a notice of a proposed rule reorganizing the certification of, and streamlining the approval of safety advancements for, small airplanes.

The FAA shall establish:

  • the FAA Task Force on Flight Standards Reform, and
  • a Regional Consistency Communications Board.

The FAA shall establish a safety workforce training strategy.

DOT shall take appropriate actions to promote U.S. aerospace standards, products, and services abroad.

The FAA shall appoint a Designated Agency Safety and Health Officer.

DOT shall develop a comprehensive plan to accelerate the integration of civil unmanned aircraft systems (drones) into the national airspace system.

The bill establishes in the FAA an Unmanned Aircraft Systems (UAS) Integration Office.

DOT shall establish a UAS detection systems pilot program.

The bill prescribes certain requirements with respect to improving passenger air service.

The bill also reauthorizes for FY2016-FY2022 the essential air service program and the small community air service development program.

The FAA shall submit to Congress a strategic cybersecurity plan.

DOT shall establish a remote air traffic control tower pilot program for rural or small communities.