There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

EPS Improvement Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

EPS Improvement Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to exclude power supply circuits, drivers, and devices designed to be connected to, and power, light-emitting diodes or organic light-emitting diodes providing illumination from energy conservation standards for external power supplies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
02/29/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1006)
02/03/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/14/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/01/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
02/29/2016-4:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/29/2016-4:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1006)
02/29/2016-3:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4444.
02/29/2016-3:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1006-1008)
02/29/2016-3:55pmHouseMr. Whitfield moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/25/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/25/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/24/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/11/2016HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power
02/11/2016HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power
02/10/2016HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power
02/03/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/03/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/03/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/03/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/03/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/03/2016
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/03/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/03/2016 Referred to
02/25/2016 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power02/03/2016 Referred to
02/11/2016 Markup by
02/11/2016 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/14/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4444. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (02/29/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

EPS Improvement Act of 2016

This bill amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to exclude from energy conservation standards for external power supplies any power supply circuit, driver, or device designed to power certain light-emitting diodes or to power ceiling fans using direct current motors. The Department of Energy may prescribe energy conservation standards for that equipment no earlier than one year after the date on which a test procedure has been prescribed by using its authority to improve the energy efficiency of electric motors and pumps and other industrial equipment.